Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2266 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 05/22/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Leach (Senate Sponsor - Middleton) H.B. No. 2266
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2023;
 May 12, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 21, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 4, one present not voting; May 21, 2023, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 SchwertnerX
 KingX
 BirdwellX
 CampbellX
 CreightonX
 JohnsonX
 KolkhorstX
 MenéndezX
 MiddletonX
 NicholsX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to judicial review of certain local laws applicable to
 state license holders.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act may be cited as the Regulations with
 Economic Impact in Need of Scrutiny (REINS) Act.
 SECTION 2.  The purpose of this Act is to provide a judicial
 remedy to ensure that a state license holder has the right to engage
 in an occupation or business activity authorized by and regulated
 under state law without burdensome or inconsistent local regulation
 of the state license holder's occupation or lawful business
 activities.
 SECTION 3.  Title 2, Occupations Code, is amended by adding
 Chapter 60 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 60. JUDICIAL REVIEW OF CERTAIN LOCAL LAWS AFFECTING
 LICENSE HOLDERS
 Sec. 60.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Local law" means an ordinance, rule, regulation,
 or other measure adopted by the governing body of a municipality
 that establishes requirements for, imposes restrictions on, or
 otherwise regulates the occupation or business activity of a
 license holder within the municipality or the municipality's
 extraterritorial jurisdiction.
 (2)  "License holder" means an individual or entity
 that, under state law, in order to practice the individual's
 occupation or conduct the entity's business in this state, is
 required to obtain a license, permit, registration certificate, or
 other evidence of authority from, and is subject to regulation by, a
 state licensing authority.
 (3)  "State licensing authority" means a state agency,
 department, board, or commission or the executive or administrative
 officer of a state agency, department, board, or commission that
 issues a license, permit, registration certificate, or other
 evidence of authority to an individual or entity authorizing the
 individual to practice the individual's occupation or the entity to
 conduct the entity's business in this state.
 Sec. 60.002.  SUIT TO ENJOIN ENFORCEMENT OF CERTAIN LOCAL
 LAWS AFFECTING LICENSE HOLDERS. (a) A license holder subject to a
 local law may bring an action under this section to enjoin the
 enforcement of the local law if the local law:
 (1)  establishes requirements for, imposes
 restrictions on, or otherwise regulates the occupation or business
 activity of the license holder in a manner that is more stringent
 than the requirements, restrictions, or regulations imposed on the
 license holder under state law; or
 (2)  would result in an adverse economic impact on the
 license holder.
 (b)  A license holder must bring the action in a district
 court in:
 (1)  a county that includes any territory of the
 municipality that adopted the local law; or
 (2)  Travis County.
 (c)  The license holder bringing the action under this
 section must show by a preponderance of the evidence that the local
 law is a local law described by Subsection (a). The license holder
 may provide evidence regarding the adverse economic impact of
 similar local laws in other jurisdictions inside or outside of this
 state.
 (d)  If the license holder satisfies the burden of proof
 required by Subsection (c), the municipality defending the action
 has the burden of establishing by clear and convincing evidence
 that the local law:
 (1)  does not conflict with state law; and
 (2)  is necessary and narrowly tailored to protect
 against actual and specific harm to the public's health or safety.
 (e)  The court may grant any prohibitory or mandatory relief
 warranted by the facts, including a temporary restraining order,
 temporary injunction, or permanent injunction.
 (f)  If the license holder prevails in the action, the court
 shall award to the license holder court costs and reasonable and
 necessary attorney's fees to be paid by the municipality defending
 the action.
 (g)  This section does not apply to a local law that
 establishes requirements for, imposes restrictions on, or
 otherwise regulates:
 (1)  a sexually oriented business under Chapter 243,
 Local Government Code;
 (2)  a massage parlor as defined by Section 234.101,
 Local Government Code; or
 (3)  any conduct under Chapter 393, Finance Code, and
 any conduct related to a credit services organization, as defined
 by Section 393.001, Finance Code, or a credit access business, as
 defined by Section 393.601, Finance Code, if the local law:
 (A)  was adopted before January 1, 2023; and
 (B)  would have been valid under the law as it
 existed before the date this chapter was enacted.
 (h)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this section:
 (1)  a license holder may not bring an action under this
 section against a municipality if the license holder is an employee
 of the municipality; and
 (2)  an association of municipal employees who are
 license holders may not bring an action under this section if the
 action relates to a local law governing the working conditions of
 those employees.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *