Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2266 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 25, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 17, 2023
Bill May 11, 2023
Bill May 11, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 22, 2023
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2023
Bill April 25, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023