Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2328 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/10/2023 3:00 pm
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/19/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/10/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 S Co-sponsor authorized
Introduced
Last Action: 04/10/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/10/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/10/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Vet Affairs
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately