E
|
06/12/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/12/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6491
|
E
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5975
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2994
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5615
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5303
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5137
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2464
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1742
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1742
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1619
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3469
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3257
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3253
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1176
|
Journal Page: 3257
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3257
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3257
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3228
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3228
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2792
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1742
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 599
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|