Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2495 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023
Bill February 17, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 2, 2023
Analysis May 1, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 12, 2023
Bill May 6, 2023
Bill May 6, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 17, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2023
Bill May 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 14, 2023
Fiscal Note April 27, 2023
Fiscal Note April 13, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 12, 2023
Analysis May 1, 2023