Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2130
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1548
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3075
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2845
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#956
|
Journal Page: 2844
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2844
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2844
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2776
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#902
|
Journal Page: 2775
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2775
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2775
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 602
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|