Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2533 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 05/22/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Walle, Gates (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2533
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2023;
 May 12, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 22, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 BettencourtX
 SpringerX
 EckhardtX
 GutierrezX
 HallX
 NicholsX
 ParkerX
 PaxtonX
 WestX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the implementation of a statewide homeless data sharing
 network to share real time data on homelessness.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 2306, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter QQ to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER QQ. HOMELESS DATA SHARING
 Sec. 2306.1151.  HOMELESS DATA SHARING NETWORK. (a) Using
 available resources, the department in collaboration with the Texas
 Homeless Network shall implement a homeless data sharing network
 through which homeless response systems and data warehouse vendors
 are able to share and assess real-time data on homelessness
 throughout this state.
 (b)  In implementing the homeless data sharing network, the
 department shall collaborate with health benefit plan issuers and
 managed care organizations to:
 (1)  identify individuals experiencing homelessness;
 and
 (2)  connect and refer those individuals to available
 services and resources, including housing navigation assistance,
 for the purpose of improving health outcomes.
 (c)  The department shall ensure that information shared
 through the homeless data sharing network that is confidential
 under state or federal law is not disclosed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *