House | 04/25/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2048 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 603 | |
House | 03/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 603 | |
House | 02/21/2023 | Filed |