E
|
05/23/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
05/23/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5303
|
E
|
05/11/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4221
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4045
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4049
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1748
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3711
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1679
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1679
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1679
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1679
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1678
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1678
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1678
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1695
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1655
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1596
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1595
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1234
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1234
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1200
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1841
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1735
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#345
|
Journal Page: 1735
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1735
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1735
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1724
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1724
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1234
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred to International Relations & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 605
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|