Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2575 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 12, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 4, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2023
Bill May 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note April 5, 2023
Fiscal Note March 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 12, 2023