Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2581 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/19/2023 10:30 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Introduced
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Introduced
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Postponed
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars