Last Action: 06/09/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Considered in Calendars
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/01/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 03/29/2023 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 03/29/2023 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 03/29/2023 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 03/29/2023 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 03/29/2023 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Last Action: 05/30/2023 E Filed with the Secretary of State
Last Action: 03/29/2023 H Left pending in committee