E | 06/11/2023 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/11/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6490 | |
E | 05/26/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5975 | |
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2994 | |
House | 05/25/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5614 | |
House | 05/23/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5303 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4992 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2380 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2380 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2380 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2380 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2380 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2380 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2380 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2242 | |
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2148 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 1959 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1959 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1866 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4317 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4091 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Record vote | RV#1580 | Journal Page: 4091 |
House | 05/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4091 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4091 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 4062 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4062 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3468 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1959 | |
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 644 | |
House | 02/27/2023 | Filed |