Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2947 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 7, 2023
Analysis May 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 12, 2023
Bill May 12, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 19, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2023
Bill May 23, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note May 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill May 7, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 6, 2023