Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2757
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2242
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1959
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1959
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1866
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4317
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4091
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1580
|
Journal Page: 4091
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4091
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4091
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 4062
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4062
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3211
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1959
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 649
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|