Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3005 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 05/20/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Flores, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Alvarado) H.B. No. 3005
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 15, 2023;
 May 16, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 19, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 WhitmireX
 FloresX
 BettencourtX
 HinojosaX
 HuffmanX
 KingX
 MilesX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the confidentiality of identifying information of
 victims of certain offenses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Subchapter D, Chapter 58, Code of
 Criminal Procedure, is amended to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER D. CONFIDENTIALITY OF IDENTIFYING INFORMATION OF
 VICTIMS OF STALKING, INVASIVE VISUAL RECORDING, OR INDECENT ASSAULT
 SECTION 2.  Article 58.151, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Art. 58.151.  DEFINITION.  In this subchapter, "victim"
 means a person who is the subject of:
 (1)  an offense that allegedly constitutes:
 (A)  stalking under Section 42.072, Penal Code;
 (B)  invasive visual recording under Section
 21.15, Penal Code; or
 (C)  indecent assault under Section 22.012, Penal
 Code; or
 (2)  an offense that is part of the same criminal
 episode, as defined by Section 3.01, Penal Code, as an offense
 described by Subdivision (1) [under Section 42.072, Penal Code].
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *