Senate | 05/01/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 1090 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1090 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 970 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1530 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1473 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Record vote | RV#199 | Journal Page: 1473 |
House | 04/14/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1473 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1473 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1458 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1458 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 813 | |
House | 03/15/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1090 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 316 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |