Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB349 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 21, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis April 30, 2023
Bill April 14, 2023
Bill April 14, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis April 29, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 28, 2023
Fiscal Note March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 21, 2023