LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB3788
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB3788
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB3788
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/17/2023
11:30 am
Youth Health & Safety, Select Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.026
HB1537
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Postponed
HB3639
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Referred to Education
HB3788
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB4449
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Failed to pass to engrossment
HB4625
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
HB4845
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Education
HB4882
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to Education
HB5284
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar