Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3800 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/10/2023 2:30 pm
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/18/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/10/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Referred to Education
Introduced
Last Action: 04/10/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Referred to Education
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Referred to Education
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Education
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23