Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4171 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/05/2023 10:30 am
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Placed on intent calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/05/2023 H No action taken in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/21/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/18/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Local Government