Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2325
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1988
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1602
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1602
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1508
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2915
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2626
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#791
|
Journal Page: 2626
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2626
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2626
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2600
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2600
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2195
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1602
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 787
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|