Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4194 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 05/16/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Perez, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 4194
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2023;
 May 5, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 16, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0;
 May 16, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4194 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an appraisal process for disputed losses under personal
 automobile or residential property insurance policies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle A, Title 10, Insurance Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 1813 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 1813. APPRAISAL OF DISPUTED LOSSES
 Sec. 1813.001.  APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER. (a)  This chapter
 applies only to a personal automobile or residential property
 insurance policy delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed in this
 state by an insurer, including:
 (1)  a capital stock insurance company;
 (2)  a mutual insurance company;
 (3)  a county mutual insurance company;
 (4)  a Lloyd's plan;
 (5)  a reciprocal or interinsurance exchange;
 (6)  a farm mutual insurance company;
 (7)  an eligible surplus lines insurer if this state is
 the insured's home state as defined by Section 981.002; and
 (8)  the FAIR Plan Association.
 (b)  This chapter does not apply to:
 (1)  an insurance policy delivered, issued for
 delivery, or renewed by the Texas Windstorm Insurance Association;
 or
 (2)  a commercial insurance policy.
 Sec. 1813.002.  RULES. The commissioner may adopt rules
 necessary to implement this chapter.
 Sec. 1813.003.  REQUIRED POLICY PROVISION: APPRAISAL
 PROCESS. (a)  An insurance policy described by Section 1813.001(a)
 must contain an appraisal provision that complies with this
 chapter.
 (b)  The appraisal provision required by this chapter is
 intended to provide a type of dispute resolution process solely to
 determine the amount of loss when that amount is in dispute between
 the policyholder and the insurer.
 Sec. 1813.004.  EFFECT OF APPRAISAL. An appraisal under the
 provision required by this chapter does not affect any applicable
 policy terms.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 1813, Insurance Code, as added by this
 Act, applies only to an insurance policy delivered, issued for
 delivery, or renewed on or after January 1, 2024.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *