Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4194 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 25, 2023
Analysis April 25, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 10, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 16, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Analysis April 25, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note May 10, 2023
Fiscal Note April 21, 2023
Fiscal Note April 11, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2023
Bill April 25, 2023