E
|
05/27/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/27/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6429
|
E
|
05/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1918
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4313
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4387
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4218
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1830
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1830
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1830
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1829
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1829
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1829
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1829
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1750
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1490
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred to Border Security
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1036
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1544
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#238
|
Journal Page: 1544
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1544
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1544
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1514
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Murr
|
Journal Page: 1513
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1513
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1344
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 805
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|