Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4422 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 14, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 10, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 2, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 10, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2023
Bill May 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2023
Bill April 10, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 3, 2023
Fiscal Note April 7, 2023
Fiscal Note March 29, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 2, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023