Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5346 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/19/2023 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Jurisprudence
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Jurisprudence