Senate | 04/24/2023 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 1233 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1233 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1197 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1841 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1755 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Record vote | RV#365 | Journal Page: 1755 |
House | 04/20/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1755 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1755 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1700 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Amended | 1-Vasut | Journal Page: 1700 |
House | 04/19/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1700 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1009 | |
House | 03/30/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1233 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 332 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |