E | 06/10/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 06/10/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6490 | |
E | 05/24/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5620 | |
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2480 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4980 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4998 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4634 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2087 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2087 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2087 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2086 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2086 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2086 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2086 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1988 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 916 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 916 | |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 829 | |
House | 04/06/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1304 | |
House | 04/06/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1053 | |
House | 04/06/2023 | Record vote | RV#100 | Journal Page: 1053 |
House | 04/06/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1053 | |
House | 04/06/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1052 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1038 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1038 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 913 | |
House | 03/16/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 916 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 338 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |