Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB639 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 24, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 13, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 16, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill May 19, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2023
Bill March 24, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 15, 2023
Fiscal Note March 10, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 13, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023