Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2242
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1233
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1233
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1071
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1793
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1650
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#309
|
Journal Page: 1650
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1650
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1650
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#295
|
Journal Page: 1615
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1615
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1615
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 813
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1233
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 398
|
House
|
11/29/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|