Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB821 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 05/20/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: King of Hemphill, et al. H.B. No. 821
 (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2023;
 April 24, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 19, 2023, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 3; May 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the placement of electric vehicle charging equipment on
 state property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 2165, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2165.010 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2165.010.  PLACEMENT OF ELECTRIC VEHICLE CHARGING
 EQUIPMENT ON STATE PROPERTY. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Charging provider" means a person who provides to
 another person the use of electric vehicle charging equipment in a
 commercial transaction.
 (2)  "Electric vehicle charging equipment" means
 equipment manufactured for transferring electric energy from
 electric supply to an electric vehicle.
 (3)  "Metering device" means a commercial device used
 to measure electric energy transferred by electric vehicle charging
 equipment and compute the charge for the transferred energy.
 (b)  A state agency in charge and control of state property,
 including a state park, may enter into an agreement authorizing a
 charging provider to place and maintain electric vehicle charging
 equipment on the property.
 (c)  An agreement described by Subsection (b):
 (1)  must require the charging provider to use a
 metering device to determine the cost of electricity transferred to
 another person through electric vehicle charging equipment; and
 (2)  may include any other reasonable requirements on
 the use of the property.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *