E
|
06/10/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/10/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6490
|
E
|
05/25/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5896
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2712
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5135
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5142
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4985
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2312
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2312
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2312
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2312
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2312
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2312
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2312
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 1233
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1233
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1197
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1841
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1753
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#362
|
Journal Page: 1752
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1752
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1752
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1698
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1698
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1344
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1233
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 412
|
House
|
12/13/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|