Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB995 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2022
Bill December 13, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 11, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 15, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 17, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2023
Bill May 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2023
Bill April 11, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 15, 2023
Fiscal Note March 30, 2023
Fiscal Note March 21, 2023