Senate | 05/05/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1550 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2861 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Record vote | RV#965 | Journal Page: 2860 |
House | 05/03/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2860 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2860 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2578 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1603 | |
House | 03/15/2023 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 692 | |
House | 03/08/2023 | Filed |