Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR166 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2023
Bill
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 28, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 26, 2023
Fiscal Note April 3, 2023