House | 05/01/2023 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2472 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2472 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 1015 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | Journal Page: 911 | |
House | 03/24/2023 | Filed |