Last Action: 05/05/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Last Action: 05/05/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Last Action: 05/05/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:27PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:27PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:28PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:28PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:28PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:13PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:18PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:12PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:12PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:12PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:12PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:12PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:28PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:38PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:42PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 5:00PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 5:00PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:28PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:40PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:40PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:42PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:46PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 5:01PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 5:10PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 5:09PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 5:15PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 5:17PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 5:05PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 5:15PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 5:44PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 5:44PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 5:44PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 5:45PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 5:47PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 6:03PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 6:18PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 6:03PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 6:03PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 6:02PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 6:02PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 6:18PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 6:42PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 6:42PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 6:42PM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 9:45AM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 9:55AM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 9:48AM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 9:55AM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 9:55AM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 10:23AM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 10:23AM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 10:24AM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 10:24AM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 10:22AM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 10:23AM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 9:55AM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 9:58AM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 10:01AM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:42PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:42PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:54PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:42PM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 10:05AM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 10:09AM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 9:35AM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:42PM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 9:35AM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 9:35AM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 9:35AM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 8:38AM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 3:58PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:04PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:13PM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 8:38AM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 8:42AM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 3:59PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:42PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 3:59PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 3:10PM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 8:45AM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 9:04AM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:42PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 3:59PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 3:59PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 3:59PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:03PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:03PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:04PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:04PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:04PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 3:10PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:42PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:42PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:54PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:43PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:43PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:43PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:54PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:43PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:43PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:43PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:11PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:12PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:29PM
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 17 2023 3:21PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:40PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 5:01PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 5:10PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 5:14PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 5:17PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 5:24PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 5:45PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:31PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:54PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 4:16PM
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 21 2023 9:04AM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 3:10PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:42PM
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Reported enrolled: Apr 20 2023 2:42PM