LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1167
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1167
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1167
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/22/2023
9:00 am
Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.012
SB501
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/12/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
SB502
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective immediately
SB604
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E See remarks for effective date
SB667
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SCR13
Introduced
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Signed by the Governor
SB784
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1114
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 12 2023 12:21PM
SB1167
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2023 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 14 2023 11:51AM
SB1420
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately