E
|
05/13/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/13/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1929
|
E
|
05/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1491
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2788
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1455
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1443
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2380
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2374
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#681
|
Journal Page: 2380
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2380
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2380
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2360
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2360
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2914
|
Journal Page: 2360
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2342
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1791
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1185
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1099
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1099
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1099
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1099
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1099
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1099
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1099
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Recommendations filed with the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1006
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 357
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|