Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1226 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 8, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 26, 2023
Analysis April 26, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 17, 2023
Analysis April 14, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 29, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 29, 2023
Analysis April 26, 2023
Analysis April 14, 2023
Analysis April 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 13, 2023
Fiscal Note April 10, 2023