Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1226 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 S.B. No. 1226
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to the term of office for a director of the Northeast Texas
66 Municipal Water District.
77 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
88 SECTION 1. Section 3, Chapter 78, Acts of the 53rd
99 Legislature, Regular Session, 1953, is amended by amending
1010 Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
1111 (a) All powers of the District shall be exercised by a Board
1212 of Directors. Such directors shall be appointed by a majority vote
1313 of [for] the governing body of each of the cities contained in the
1414 District. [In appointing the first directors for a city containing
1515 5,000 population or more according to the most recent Federal
1616 Census, the governing body of such city shall appoint one director
1717 who shall serve to and including May 31, 1954, and one who shall
1818 serve to and including May 31, 1955.] In [May, 1954, and in] May of
1919 each even-numbered year [thereafter], the governing bodies [body]
2020 of Avinger, Hughes Springs, Jefferson, and Ore City each [such
2121 city] shall appoint one director for a [the] two year term beginning
2222 on June 1 [1st] of that year. In May of each odd-numbered year, the
2323 governing bodies of Daingerfield, Lone Star, and Pittsburg each
2424 shall appoint one director for a two year term beginning on June 1
2525 of that year. [In appointing the first director for a city of less
2626 than 5,000 population according to the most recent Federal Census,
2727 the governing body of such city shall appoint one director who shall
2828 serve to and including May 31, 1954. In May, 1954, and in May of
2929 each even year thereafter, the governing body shall appoint one
3030 director for the two year term beginning on June 1st of that year.]
3131 Each director shall serve for the director's [his] term of office as
3232 herein provided, and thereafter until the director's [his]
3333 successor shall be appointed and qualified. A governing body of a
3434 city may not appoint a [No] person to the position of [shall be
3535 appointed] a director unless the person [he] resides in and owns
3636 taxable property in the city [from which he is appointed]. A
3737 governing body of a city may not appoint a [No] member of a
3838 governing body of a city or an[, and no] employee of a city [shall be
3939 appointed as director]. Such directors shall subscribe the
4040 constitutional oath of office, and each shall give bond for the
4141 faithful performance of the director's [his] duties in the amount
4242 of Five Thousand ($5,000.00) Dollars, the cost of which shall be
4343 paid by the District. A majority shall constitute a quorum.
4444 (a-1) If the population of a city described by Subsection
4545 (a) of this section is 5,000 or more, the governing body of the city
4646 is entitled to appoint a second director to serve a term that ends
4747 on May 31 of the year following the expiration of the term of the
4848 serving director appointed by the governing body of that city under
4949 Subsection (a) of this section and every second year thereafter. If
5050 the population of the city described by Subsection (a) of this
5151 section is less than 5,000 and the governing body of the city has
5252 two director positions by an earlier application of this
5353 subsection, the governing body of the city is entitled to appoint
5454 only one director and the director position for the city that
5555 expires on the first May 31 following the most recent federal
5656 decennial census that shows a population less than 5,000 is
5757 eliminated effective on that date.
5858 SECTION 2. Section 6, Chapter 78, Acts of the 53rd
5959 Legislature, Regular Session, 1953, is amended to read as follows:
6060 Sec. 6. (a) This section applies only to the annexation of a
6161 city by the District other than the cities described by Section 3 of
6262 this Act.
6363 (b) When [any city,] the territory of a city with a
6464 population of 5,000 [which] is [hereafter] annexed to the District,
6565 [contains 5,000 inhabitants or more according to the most recent
6666 Federal Census,] the governing body of the city shall appoint one
6767 director for the term ending the following May 31 [31st], and one
6868 director for the term ending one year after the following May 31
6969 [31st], and in May of each year shall appoint one director for a two
7070 year term the same as provided in this Act for cities described by
7171 Section 3(a-1) of this Act [originally included in the District].
7272 If the population of the annexed city at a later date is less than
7373 5,000, the governing body of the city is entitled to appoint only
7474 one director and the director position for that city that expires on
7575 the first May 31 following the most recent federal decennial census
7676 that shows a population less than 5,000 is eliminated effective on
7777 that date.
7878 (c) When the territory of a city with a population of less
7979 than 5,000 is annexed to the District [If such city contains less
8080 than 5,000 inhabitants according to the most recent Federal
8181 Census], the governing body of the city shall appoint one director
8282 whose term shall expire the following May 31 [31st], and in May of
8383 each second year thereafter shall appoint one director for a two
8484 year term beginning on June 1 of that year and expiring on May 31 two
8585 years later. Whenever such city may later attain a population of
8686 5,000 or more [according to the Federal Census], the governing body
8787 of the city is [it shall thereafter be] entitled to appoint two
8888 directors in the manner [to be appointed as herein] provided by
8989 Section 3(a-1) of this Act.
9090 (d) A person appointed as a director under this section must
9191 meet the qualifications for office provided by Section 3(a) of this
9292 Act.
9393 SECTION 3. (a) A person who is appointed by the governing
9494 body of the city of Avinger, Hughes Springs, Jefferson, or Ore City
9595 and is serving as a director of the Northeast Texas Municipal Water
9696 District on the effective date of this Act may continue to serve as
9797 a director for a term of office that expires May 31, 2024.
9898 (b) As soon as practicable after the effective date of this
9999 Act, the governing bodies of the cities of Daingerfield, Lone Star,
100100 and Pittsburg shall each appoint a person to serve as a director of
101101 the Northeast Texas Municipal Water District for a term of office
102102 that begins June 1, 2023, and expires May 31, 2025.
103103 SECTION 4. (a) The legal notice of the intention to
104104 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
105105 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
106106 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
107107 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
108108 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
109109 Government Code.
110110 (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has
111111 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
112112 Environmental Quality.
113113 (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
114114 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
115115 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
116116 representatives within the required time.
117117 (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
118118 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
119119 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
120120 and accomplished.
121121 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
122122 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
123123 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
124124 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
125125 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
126126 ______________________________ ______________________________
127127 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
128128 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1226 passed the Senate on
129129 April 20, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
130130 ______________________________
131131 Secretary of the Senate
132132 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1226 passed the House on
133133 April 28, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 131, Nays 13, two
134134 present not voting.
135135 ______________________________
136136 Chief Clerk of the House
137137 Approved:
138138 ______________________________
139139 Date
140140 ______________________________
141141 Governor