LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1244
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1244
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1244
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/22/2023
9:00 am
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.036
SB10
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/14/2023 E See remarks for effective date
SB22
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/07/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB65
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
SB987
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
SB1237
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1243
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective immediately
SB1244
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Referred to Appropriations: Apr 21 2023 10:27AM
SCR28
Introduced
Last Action: 05/10/2023 E Signed by the Governor