LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1396
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1396
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1396
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/29/2023
9:00 am
Education Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.028
SB13
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 24 2023 7:06PM
SB163
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
SB164
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 28 2023 2:39PM
SB544
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1396
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/25/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 25 2023 5:13PM
SB1861
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Postponed
SB2089
Introduced
Last Action: 03/29/2023 S Left pending in committee
SB2482
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
SB2565
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 27 2023 6:39PM
SB662
Introduced
Last Action: 03/29/2023 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .