LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1509
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1509
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1509
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/29/2023
9:00 am
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.036
SB1013
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1207
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1245
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
SB1246
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
SB1332
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1333
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/13/2023 E See remarks for effective date
SB1444
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E See remarks for effective date
SB1498
Introduced
Last Action: 03/29/2023 S Left pending in committee
SB1509
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective immediately
SB1831
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective immediately