Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1520 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/24/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/15/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Signed by the Governor
05/11/2023 8:00 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Signed by the Governor
04/05/2023 8:30 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Introduced
Last Action: 04/05/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Referred to Ways & Means: May 4 2023 8:56PM
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/27/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23