LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1537
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1537
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1537
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/20/2023
9:00 am
Subcommittee on Higher Education Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.028
SB2029
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 H Referred to Higher Education: May 17 2023 4:04PM
SB1489
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Referred to Higher Education: May 10 2023 1:53AM
SB2240
Introduced
Last Action: 04/20/2023 S Left pending in subcommittee
SB1537
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 H Referred to Higher Education: May 16 2023 2:34PM
SB692
Introduced
Last Action: 04/20/2023 S Left pending in subcommittee
SB429
Introduced
Last Action: 04/20/2023 S Left pending in subcommittee