House | 05/01/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2576 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1448 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1424 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1424 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1424 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1424 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1424 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1395 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Bettencourt | Journal Page: 1395 |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1395 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 1395 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1395 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1395 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1042 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 456 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 456 | |
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |