Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1581 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 27, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 18, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Comm Sub

Bill April 18, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 17, 2023
Fiscal Note March 28, 2023