Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1720 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/24/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Introduced
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 24 2023 4:04PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 24 2023 4:04PM
05/09/2023 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Left pending in committee
SB9
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Postponed
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/19/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
04/05/2023 9:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Postponed
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 28 2023 2:39PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Referred to Public Education: May 4 2023 8:56PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety: Apr 28 2023 2:39PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/05/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 04/05/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23